WY HB0106 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - COW:Failed 11-14-5-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - COW:Failed 11-14-5-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; revising provisions relating to political party affiliation changes by electors; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Party affiliation changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - COW:Failed 11-14-5-0-0 (Y: 11 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | COW:Failed 11-14-5-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-20 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-29 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-01-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-09 | Bill Number Assigned |