WY HB0118 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-14-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-14-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to firearms regulation; establishing the Second Amendment Preservation Act; describing certain actions as infringing on the right to keep and bear arms; objecting to certain actions by the federal government; providing for the protection of specified rights; providing legislative declaration of authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Second Amendment Preservation Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-14-1-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-11-3-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-2-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 45-13-2-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-11-3-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-2-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 45-13-2-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 15-14-1-0-0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 20-9-1-0-0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-11-3-0-0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-03-04 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-2-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-24 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 45-13-2-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-06 | Bill Number Assigned |