WY HB0133 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; providing for scholarships to out-of-state students to attend Wyoming institutions of higher education; specifying scholarship amounts, eligibility requirements and other elements of the scholarships; providing for resident tuition for scholarship recipients; creating a selection committee; creating accounts; making the award of scholarships contingent on funding as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Hathaway expand Wyoming scholarships.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] | Sen. James Anderson [R] |
Sen. Liisa Anselmi-Dalton [D] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] | Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - Concur:Passed 55-3-2-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 81 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0039 | |
2019-02-19 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0039 |
2019-02-19 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0039 |
2019-02-15 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0039 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Concur:Passed 55-3-2-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-14 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-08 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-31 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-29 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-18 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-01-14 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |