WY HB0141 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; providing that motor vehicles are not required to display a front license plate; specifying that the department of transportation shall only issue one (1) license plate for motor vehicles; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Front license plate freedom.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Scott Clem [R] | Rep. Shelly Duncan [R] |
Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Rep. Carl Loucks [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] |
Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] | Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-18 - House - H08 - Transportation:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-18 | House | H08 - Transportation:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2019-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |