WY HB0145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - COW:Failed 12-18-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - COW:Failed 12-18-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses and criminal procedure; repealing the death penalty; eliminating procedures related to the imposition and execution of death sentences; making conforming amendments; providing applicability; remanding existing death sentences; repealing obsolete provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Death penalty repeal-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - COW:Failed 12-18-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-21-3-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-21-3-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | COW:Failed 12-18-0-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-13 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 36-21-3-0-0 |
2019-01-31 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-24 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2019-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |