WY HB0151 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - COW:Failed 22-36-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to cities, towns and counties; prohibiting the implementation of immigration sanctuary policies by cities, towns and counties; providing penalties; requiring certification of compliance; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ban on sanctuary cities and counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - COW:Failed 22-36-2-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30HouseCOW:Failed 22-36-2-0-0
2019-01-22HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-22HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-15HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback