WY HB0152 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to underground public utility facilities; modifying requirements for architectural and engineering plans that call for excavation; requiring premarking of an area or path of excavation as specified; requiring emergency services for contact with or damage to underground facilities as specified; providing exemptions from notice requirements as specified; modifying penalties; providing for definitions; requiring reports; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Underground Facilities Notification Act-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-1-3-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-1-3-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 79 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0042 | |
2019-02-19 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0042 |
2019-02-19 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0042 |
2019-02-15 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0042 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-14 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-08 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-1-3-0-0 |
2019-01-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-17 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |