WY HB0154 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public benefits; conditioning eligibility for state or local public benefits on lawful presence in the United States; requiring verification of lawful presence in the United States upon application for state or local public benefits; specifying penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Restriction on public benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Jennings [R] | Rep. David Miller [R] | Rep. William Pownall [R] | Sen. Tim Salazar [R] |
Rep. Richard Tass [R] | Sen. David Kinskey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-6-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-30 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-6-0-0-0 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |