WY HB0155 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to guardianships; authorizing court orders related to the termination of guardianships as specified; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardianships-reintegration planning authorized.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-15-2-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Assigned Chapter Number 130
2019-02-27 Governor Signed HEA No. 0079
2019-02-25SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0079
2019-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0079
2019-02-22 Assigned Number HEA No. 0079
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-13SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-02-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-01House3rd Reading:Passed 43-15-2-0-0
2019-01-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-30HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-24HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-24HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback