WY HB0159 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the state self-insurance program; providing volunteer reserve officers coverage under the state self-insurance program; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Volunteer reserve officers-liability coverage.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Jennings [R] | Rep. William Pownall [R] | Rep. Art Washut [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] |
Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-4-2-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-4-2-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 115 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0057 | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0057 |
2019-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0057 |
2019-02-20 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0057 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-11 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-25 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 54-4-2-0-0 |
2019-01-24 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-23 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-22 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |