WY HB0177 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; removing the prosecutorial consent requirement for participation in a court supervised treatment program; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Court supervised treatment programs-prosecutor's consent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Adopted HB0177JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Adopted HB0177JC001: 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Concur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Adopted HB0177JC001: 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Concur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number 195 | |
2019-03-08 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0121 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0121 |
2019-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0121 |
2019-02-27 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0121 | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-22 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-22 | House | Concur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0 |
2019-02-21 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-08 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2019-01-31 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-28 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |