WY HB0179 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to food trucks; providing for state licensure of food trucks; requiring a fee; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Food trucks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2019-02-04 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0179 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Introduced/HB0179.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Fiscal/HB0179.pdf |