WY HB0206 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to gaming; providing for regulation of video skill games by the liquor division of the department of revenue; requiring permitting of video skill game vendors; providing for fees; providing for criminal history record checks; providing penalties; providing rulemaking authority; authorizing play on video skill games; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Video skill games.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] |
Rep. Patrick Sweeney [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] | Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2019-02-04 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0206 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Introduced/HB0206.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Fiscal/HB0206.pdf |