WY HB0209 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; revising provisions relating to political party affiliation changes by electors; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change in party affiliation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 40-17-3-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateS:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2020-03-11SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2020-03-02SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-28House3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0
2020-02-27House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-21HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-21HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2020-02-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 40-17-3-0-0
2020-02-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback