WY HB0212 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; allowing microbrewery or winery permit holders to hold manufacturer's licenses as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages-business flexibility.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Shelly Duncan [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Rep. Patrick Sweeney [R] |
Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Assigned Chapter Number 158 | |
2019-02-28 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0107 | |
2019-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0107 |
2019-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0107 |
2019-02-25 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0107 | |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-20 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-29 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-01-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |