WY HB0236 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to corporations, partnerships and associations; creating statutory foundations as a new form of entity; establishing procedures and standards for the management of statutory foundation affairs; specifying liability; imposing fees as specified; providing for the operation and transfer of foreign foundations; authorizing the adoption of rules and the establishment of fees; making conforming amendments; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Statutory Foundation Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - Concur:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number 190 | |
2019-03-08 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0115 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0115 |
2019-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0115 |
2019-02-26 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0115 | |
2019-02-26 | House | Concur:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 |
2019-02-26 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-20 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | S03 Revenue:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Rerefer to S03 - Revenue |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-31 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |