WY HB0311 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - COW:Failed 6-19-5-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - COW:Failed 6-19-5-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to child support; defining a term; authorizing the award of attorney fees for intentionally misrepresenting substantial contributions or facts related to factors considered for deviating from established child support as specified; making conforming amendments; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Child support-substantial contributions.
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - COW:Failed 6-19-5-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-2-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-2-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | COW:Failed 6-19-5-0-0 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-11 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-31 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-2-0-0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-29 | Bill Number Assigned |