WY HJ0001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - COW:Failed 18-42-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - COW:Failed 18-42-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to call a convention for proposing amendments to the United States Constitution as specified.
Title
Convention for proposing constitutional amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Winters [R] | Rep. Jim Allen [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Scott Clem [R] |
Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Rep. Lars Lone [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] |
Sen. David Kinskey [R] | Sen. Ray Peterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - COW:Failed 18-42-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-30 - House - COW:Failed 18-42-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - COW:Failed 18-42-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | COW:Failed 18-42-0-0-0 |
2017-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-25 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-07 | Bill Number Assigned |