WY HJ0007 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor Signed HEJR0005
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Governor Signed HEJR0005
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress and the President of the United States to reverse the policy of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services regarding health plan coverage of
Title
Resolution-conscience rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H04 (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H04 (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Governor Signed HEJR0005 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) President Signed HEJR No. 0005 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0005 | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned Number HEJR0005 | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Did Concur | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Received for Concurrence | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-05 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-02 | (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S10 | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-21 | (H04) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |