WY SF0003 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; removing provisions providing for the loss of accumulated preference points as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Preference points.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-15 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-13 | Bill Number Assigned |