WY SF0003 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; providing for enforcement of and fines for traffic violations using an automated vehicle identification system; specifying exceptions; clarifying access to and the use of recordings from an automated vehicle identification system; providing defenses; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Automated vehicle identification systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - H08 - Transportation:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:No Recommendation 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:No Recommendation 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-04-01 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-18 | House | H08 - Transportation:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2021-03-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-03 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:No Recommendation 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-11 | Bill Number Assigned |