WY SF0006 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-29-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-29-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to property taxes; revising the penalty for failing to report property to the county assessor; requiring the department of audit to collect property information during audits as specified; providing fees for nonreported and omitted taxable property; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Personal property tax reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-29-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-10 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-10 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 30-29-1-0-0 |
2019-02-08 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-07 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-06 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2019-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-14 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 21-9-0-0-0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-10 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-10 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-13 | Bill Number Assigned |