WY SF0008 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to courts; amending terms of court for district courts; amending duties of court commissioners as specified; amending provisions in the Code of Civil Procedure, the Probate Code and drainage district laws related to terms of court and court actions in vacation; repealing provisions related to terms of court; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Court procedure amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | Assigned Chapter Number 54 | |
2019-02-18 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0027 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0027 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0027 |
2019-02-13 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0027 | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-07 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-06 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-05 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-05 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-05 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-13 | Bill Number Assigned |