WY SF0031 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the revision of statutes; correcting statutory references and language resulting from inadvertent errors and omissions in previously adopted legislation; amending obsolete references; repealing provisions; renumbering sections; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Revisor's bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 26-1-3-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 11-0-2-0-0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 11-0-2-0-0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number 186 | |
2019-03-08 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0079 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0079 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0079 |
2019-02-27 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0079 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Concur:Passed 26-1-3-0-0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 |
2019-02-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2019-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-14 | House | H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 11-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H12 - Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-30 | Senate | S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-24 | Bill Number Assigned |