WY SF0051 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to tobacco taxes; providing for the state to enter into negotiations with the business council of the Eastern Shoshone tribe and the business council of the Northern Arapaho tribe for tobacco tax equivalence across the state; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tobacco tax equivalence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Concur:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - COW:Passed 18-7-5-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - COW:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 17-8-5-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - COW:Failed 15-15-0-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - COW:Passed 18-7-5-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - COW:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 17-8-5-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - COW:Failed 15-15-0-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 36 | |
2019-02-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0015 | |
2019-02-13 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0015 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0015 |
2019-02-12 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0015 | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Concur:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-11 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 |
2019-02-08 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-07 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-06 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2019-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-22 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-17 | Senate | COW:Passed 18-7-5-0-0 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | COW:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 17-8-5-0-0 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | COW:Failed 15-15-0-0-0 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-16 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-03 | Bill Number Assigned |