WY SF0053 | 2010 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the general revision of laws; amending archaic and obsolete provisions; correcting and updating references; conforming provisions to previous enactments; repealing provisions held to be unconstitutional; repealing fully executed and otherwise archaic or obsolete provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Obsolete laws-general revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-25 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S12 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S12 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number
2010-03-08 Governor Signed SEA No. 0023
2010-03-04 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0023
2010-03-04 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0023
2010-03-02 Assigned Number SEA No. 0023
2010-03-02 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-03-01 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-26 (H) Passed CoW
2010-02-25 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-25 (H01) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-23 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2010-02-23 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-02-22 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-02-19 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-18 (S) Passed CoW
2010-02-17 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-17 (S12) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-10 (S) Introduced and Referred to S12
2010-02-09 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-02-05 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback