WY SF0053 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0043
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to partitions of real property; requiring specified partition orders to comply with subdivision laws; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Partition actions subject to subdivision laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-19 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0043
2013-02-20SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0043
2013-02-19 Assigned Number SEA0043
2013-02-19SenateDid Concur
2013-02-15SenateReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-14HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-14 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-13HousePassed CoW
2013-02-13 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-13HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-02-07HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-07HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01
2013-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-23SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-21SenatePassed CoW
2013-01-17SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-17SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-10SenateRereferred to S06
2013-01-09SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01
2013-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2012-12-26 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback