WY SF0053 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 8 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; amending time limits for special election proceedings related to vacancies in the United States house of representatives; establishing a time limit for ballot preparation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special elections-time limits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-12 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-25 Chapter No. 8 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-02-25 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-02-25 Governor Signed SEA No. 0005
2015-02-20HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0005
2015-02-12SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0005
2015-02-12 Assigned Number SEA No. 0005
2015-02-12House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2015-02-11House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-10HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-09HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-09 Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2015-01-26HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2015-01-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-20SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-20SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-20 Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2015-01-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback