WY SF0053 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 65 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Wildlife and Natural Resource Funding Act; providing for funding of large projects under that act; specifying large projects approved for funding in 2016; requiring specified conservation easements to include the state of Wyoming as a third party beneficiary as specified; requiring certifications regarding kickbacks and gifts; providing appropriations; providing for reversion of funds; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2016 Large project funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 65 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0037
2016-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0037
2016-03-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0037
2016-03-02 Assigned Number SEA No. 0037
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2016-02-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-16SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-16 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-12SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2016-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-12 S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-01-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback