WY SF0053 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 195 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to veterans; specifying the preference in public employment for veterans and surviving spouses of deceased veterans; modifying the residency requirement for the preference; amending archaic language; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans preference.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-02 - House - Adopted SF0053JC002: 53-5-2-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0053JC002: 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Adopted SF0053JC002: 53-5-2-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0053JC002: 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0053JC001: 14-46-0-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Adopted SF0053JC001: 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0053JC001: 14-46-0-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Adopted SF0053JC001: 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-0-1-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-0-1-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - COW:Passed 30-28-2-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - COW:Passed 30-28-2-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-5-2-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-5-2-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-12 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-12 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-10 Chapter No. 195 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-10 Governor Signed SEA No. 0084
2017-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0084
2017-03-03SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0084
2017-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0084
2017-03-02HouseAdopted SF0053JC002: 53-5-2-0-0
2017-03-02SenateAdopted SF0053JC002: 21-9-0-0-0
2017-03-01 Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2017-02-28 Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
2017-02-28HouseDid Not Adopt SF0053JC001: 14-46-0-0-0
2017-02-28SenateAdopted SF0053JC001: 25-5-0-0-0
2017-02-24HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2017-02-23SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2017-02-22SenateConcur:Failed 0-29-0-1-0
2017-02-21SenateReceived for Concurrence
2017-02-21House3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0
2017-02-16House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2017-02-15House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-14HouseCOW:Passed 30-28-2-0-0
2017-02-10HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-10HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2017-02-03HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2017-01-20HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-17Senate3rd Reading:Passed 23-5-2-0-0
2017-01-16Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2017-01-13Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-12SenateCOW:Passed
2017-01-12SenatePlaced on General File
2017-01-12SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2017-01-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback