WY SF0053 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to water development; eliminating the maximum project cost limitation on small water projects; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small water projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0008
2018-03-05SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0008
2018-03-05 Assigned Number SEA No. 0008
2018-03-05House3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0
2018-03-02House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-01HouseCOW:Passed
2018-02-27HousePlaced on General File
2018-02-27HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2018-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2018-02-19HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-19Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2018-02-16Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-15SenateCOW:Passed
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-14SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0
2018-02-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback