WY SF0053 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public works and contracts; prohibiting governmental entities from including specified terms related to labor organization agreements in construction related contracts and grants; providing exemptions; providing legislative findings; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government contracts-labor organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseH:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
2019-02-21HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23Senate3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
2019-01-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-18SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-17SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-17SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-03 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback