WY SF0068 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to food and drugs; prohibiting misrepresenting a product as meat that is not derived from harvested production livestock or poultry; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Meat from harvested livestock or poultry.
Sponsors
Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] | Sen. Wyatt Agar [R] |
Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. David Kinskey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 100 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0048 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0048 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0048 |
2019-02-20 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0048 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 |
2019-02-15 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-14 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-12 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2019-01-22 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-16 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |