WY SF0075 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to concealed weapons; repealing gun free zones; providing for the carrying of concealed weapons as specified; clarifying that only the state legislature may regulate firearms, weapons and ammunition as specified; amending a definition; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal gun free zones and preemption amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - Senate - Recall from Committee failed Pursuant to SR 5-5 8-20-2-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-01-25 Recall from Committee failed Pursuant to SR 5-5 8-20-2-0-0
2019-01-23SenateS01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback