WY SF0100 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to weapons; clarifying the applicability of the preemption of firearms regulation by the state as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms preemption-applicability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseH:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
2019-02-21HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2019-02-04Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-01SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-30SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback