WY SF0105 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 130 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 130 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to food and drugs; expanding the drug donation and redispensing program as specified; creating a definition; authorizing positions; providing an appropriation; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Drug Donation Program Act-expansion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-11 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Chapter No. 130 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0061 | |
2018-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number 130 | |
2018-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0061 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0061 |
2018-03-10 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0061 | |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-09 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0 |
2018-03-08 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-07 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-03-05 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-02 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2018-03-02 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2018-03-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-22 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-13 | Bill Number Assigned |