WY SF0117 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to worker's compensation; specifying when mental injury is considered a compensable injury for first responders; providing conforming changes; and providing for an effective date.
Title
First responder workplace mental injury coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Concur:Passed 24-2-4-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 160 | |
2020-03-26 | Became Law without Governor's Signature | |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0056 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0056 |
2020-03-11 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0056 | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Concur:Passed 24-2-4-0-0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-11 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 |
2020-03-10 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-10 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-09 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-03 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2020-02-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-17 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |