WY SF0128 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - COW:Failed 11-18-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; providing criminal offenses for harm to an unborn child; providing exceptions; providing penalties; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unborn victims of violence act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - Senate - COW:Failed 11-18-1-0-0 (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04SenateCOW:Failed 11-18-1-0-0
2019-02-01SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-01SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-22 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback