WY SF0131 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; amending spending policy amounts for state funds as specified; amending amounts available for transfer to ensure certain maximum distributions are available; amending distribution of specified funds; creating an account; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Spending policy amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - Adopted SF0131JC002: 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Adopted SF0131JC002: 27-0-3-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0131JC001: 24-33-3-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Adopted SF0131JC001: 26-2-2-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Adopted SF0131JC002: 27-0-3-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0131JC001: 24-33-3-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Adopted SF0131JC001: 26-2-2-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 201 | |
2019-03-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0081 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0081 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0081 |
2019-02-27 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0081 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members |
2019-02-27 | House | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members |
2019-02-25 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 |
2019-02-15 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-14 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2019-02-13 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-12 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-31 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-28 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |