WY SF0134 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-4)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; requiring the issuance of malt beverage permits for special events as specified; providing for permit fees; specifying prohibited assessments for licensing authority costs relating to a permitted event; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Special event liquor licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Concur:Passed 18-8-4-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 34-25-1-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Amendment failed 11-19-0-0-0 (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 34-25-1-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Amendment failed 11-19-0-0-0 (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 161 | |
2020-03-26 | Became Law without Governor's Signature | |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0061 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0061 |
2020-03-12 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0061 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Concur:Passed 18-8-4-0-0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-11 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 34-25-1-0-0 |
2020-03-10 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-09 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-03 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2020-02-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-20 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 25-5-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |