WY SF0158 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the legislature; creating the legislative audit committee; providing for appointment of members; providing duties; requiring assistance by state agencies; requiring reports; creating the position of legislative auditor within the legislative service office; specifying duties of the legislative auditor; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Legislative audits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/SF0158 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Introduced/SF0158.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Fiscal/SF0158.pdf |