WY SF0160 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; revising provisions relating to political party affiliation changes by electors; providing for rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Change in political party affiliation-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2019-02-21 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-30 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |