WY SF0161 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-29-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the legislature; amending provisions relating to the selection of a management council member at large; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Management council membership-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 30-29-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-3-3-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27House3rd Reading:Failed 30-29-1-0-0
2019-02-26House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-20HouseH12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-3-3-0-0
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H12 - Rules
2019-02-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0
2019-02-05Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-31SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-31SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback