AL HB359 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Mental Health; expand category for involuntary commitment to include individuals with co-occurring substance use disorder, authorize service of petition in county of respondent's location when original petition was filed, authorize judge to determine when to bring respondent before court for hearing on restriction of liberty pending final hearing, authorize judge of probate to petition district or municipal court for suspension of criminal confinement for commitment; bill does not require providers to expand services unless additional funding provided
Title
Department of Mental Health; expand category for involuntary commitment to include individuals with co-occurring substance use disorder, authorize service of petition in county of respondent's location when original petition was filed, authorize judge to determine when to bring respondent before court for hearing on restriction of liberty pending final hearing, authorize judge of probate to petition district or municipal court for suspension of criminal confinement for commitment; bill does not require providers to expand services unless additional funding provided
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 528 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 527 VAKZLPP-1 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 526 IQ8FWWW-1 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 527 VAKZLPP-1 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 526 IQ8FWWW-1 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate Judiciary |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-11 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 528 |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 527 VAKZLPP-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Bedsole 1st Amendment Offered VAKZLPP-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 526 IQ8FWWW-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Judiciary Engrossed Substitute Offered IQ8FWWW-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Judiciary IQ8FWWW-1 |
2024-04-03 | House | Judiciary 1st Amendment JQ4VNYY-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Pending House Judiciary |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |