AL SB129 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - State Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - State Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighters, law enforcement officers, families eligible to receive death benefit as if the person died in the line of duty, resubmission of denied applications and extension of statute of limitations, Sec. 36-30-2 am'd.
Title
Firefighters, law enforcement officers, families eligible to receive death benefit as if the person died in the line of duty, resubmission of denied applications and extension of statute of limitations, Sec. 36-30-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | State Government first Amendment Offered |
2015-04-16 | House | Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from State Government with 1 amendment |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 331 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |