AL SB129 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Assigned Act No. 2022-48.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Assigned Act No. 2022-48.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
St. Clair Co., Davis Lake Volunteer Fire Department, fire protection fees, Revenue Comm. to separately state on ad valorem tax bill, Act 2017-265, 2017 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
St. Clair Co., Davis Lake Volunteer Fire Department, fire protection fees, Revenue Comm. to separately state on ad valorem tax bill, Act 2017-265, 2017 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 179 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 178 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 107 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - SBIR: McClendon motion to Adopt Roll Call 106 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 178 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 107 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - SBIR: McClendon motion to Adopt Roll Call 106 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-48. |
2022-02-17 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 179 |
2022-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 107 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |