AZ SB1129 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Unlawful occupants; property; removal
Title
Unlawful occupants; property; removal
Sponsors
Sen. Wendy Rogers [R] | Sen. David Farnsworth [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Sen. Anthony Kern [R] |
Sen. Thomas Shope [R] | Sen. Justine Wadsack [R] | Rep. John Gillette [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Governor Vetoed | |
2024-04-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-19-2-0) |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2024-03-06 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-8-4-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Affidavit
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Definition
Exception
Forcible Entry And Detainer Actions
Property
Removal
Transient Occupants
Unlawful Possession
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Definition
Exception
Forcible Entry And Detainer Actions
Property
Removal
Transient Occupants
Unlawful Possession