CA AB1926 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1374.565 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.895 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: regional enteritis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1926 Connolly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1374.565 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.895 | New Code | See Bill Text |