CA AB2033 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 26220 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: licenses to carry concealed firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 26220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |