CA AB2481 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 22.2.8 (commencing with Section 22588.2) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to social media platforms.
Title
Social media-related threats: reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and PUB. S. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22588.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |